CA SB658 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 880, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 880, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8901, 8902, and 8903 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Nominations: tax return disclosures: candidates for Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent SB658 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 658 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB658 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 658 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB658 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 880, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2865.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1407.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 11). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 8901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |