CA SB657 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26069.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis cultivation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis cultivation: county agricultural commissioners: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB657 Monning et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 657 Monning Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB657 Monning et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 252, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-08-22SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 2236.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-20SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 2757.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 14).
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-06-10AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1106.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-17SenateApril 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26069.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback