CA SB656 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 984, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 984, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9.4 of Chapter 819 of the Statutes of 1971, relating to water.
Title
Stockton-East Water District: water rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - SB 656 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Flora (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Eggman (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Eggman (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 984, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2777.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Eggman. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Eggman. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1045.) (May 6). |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |