CA SB656 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the San Diego-Coronado Bridge, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Diego-Coronado Bridge: physical suicide deterrent system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB656 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 656 Hueso Third Reading Urgency By Gloria (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3258.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-26AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-16SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom consent calendar on motion of Senator Hueso.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23106Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback