CA SB656 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the San Diego-Coronado Bridge, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
San Diego-Coronado Bridge: physical suicide deterrent system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB656 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 656 Hueso Third Reading Urgency By Gloria (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 656 Hueso Third Reading Urgency By Gloria (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB656 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3258.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator Hueso. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |