CA SB655 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 926, 926.1, 927, 927.2, and 927.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurers: diversity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 655 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2515.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1228.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 634.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 927.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 927.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |