CA SB654 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3011 and 3042 of the Family Code, relating to child custody.
Title
Child custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB654 Min et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 654 Min Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Min et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 654 Min Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Min et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3042 | Amended Code | Citation Text |