CA SB654 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19961.05 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Local moratorium: gambling tables.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 654 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2770.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19831 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19961.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19961.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |