CA SB654 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 336, 9002, and 9004 of, and to add Sections 9023 and 11042.5 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Ballot measure petitions: recall petitions: translations.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB654 Leno Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 654 Leno Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Leno (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 654 Leno Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Leno (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-11 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-11 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3219.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1161.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1018.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11042.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 336 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9006.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9023 | New Code | See Bill Text |