CA SB654 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10609.45 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services.
Title
Independent Living Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 654 Leno Senate Third Reading By PORTANTINO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB654 LENO (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB654 LENO (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6501.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 11.) | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-01-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2728.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.) | |
2010-01-20 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-01-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 497.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |