CA SB649 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-09 - Assembly - SB 649 Ashburn Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SB649 Ashburn (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by Governor.
2009-07-27 Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2009-07-09 In Senate. To enrollment.
2009-07-09 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2450.) To Senate.
2009-07-06 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-07-02 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
2009-06-23 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
2009-06-08 To Com. on TRANS.
2009-05-26 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-05-26 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly.
2009-05-21 To Special Consent Calendar.
2009-05-20 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-19 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-05-08 Set for hearing May 18.
2009-05-04 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 709.)
2009-04-21 Set for hearing April 28.
2009-04-13 Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-04-02 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-03-19 To Com. on RLS.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-02-28 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_649&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_bill_20090402_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_bill_20090504_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_bill_20090710_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_vote_20090428_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_vote_20090526_0149PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_vote_20090622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_vote_20090701_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_649_vote_20090709_1119AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback