CA SB648 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1400, 1401, 1403, 1404, 1404.5, 1405, 1407, 1408, 1409.3, and 1410 of, and to add Sections 1402, 1409.4, 1409.5, 1409.6, 1409.7, 1409.8, 1409.9, and 1409.10 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 15630 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and care facilities.
Title
Health and care facilities: referral agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB648 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 648 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 648 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By H.& C.D. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB648 Mendoza (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 648 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 648 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By H.& C.D. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB648 Mendoza (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 6236.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5970.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and JUD. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2934.) (January 21). |
2016-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2016-01-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 13). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 651.) (April 15). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |