CA SB648 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22960 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to electronic cigarettes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic cigarettes: restriction of use and advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-06 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB648 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-13AssemblySet, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-08-06AssemblySet, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
2014-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2014-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2013-08-14AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-08-07AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-08-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2013-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 1044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-20SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 754.) (April 30).
2013-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 617.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22960Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1947.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48901Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19994.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7596Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7597Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104495Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code110995Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code113978Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code114332.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code118882New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1234Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1286Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1596.795Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code6404.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code561Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99580Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12523Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_648&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20130422_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20130805_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20140618_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_bill_20140702_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20130417_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20130430_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20130524_1024AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20140625_000005_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20140806_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_648_vote_20140806_000004_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback