CA SB647 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 69846.3 to the Government Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clerk of the court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code69846.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback