CA SB647 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 263, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 263, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10232.3, 10232.45, and 10238 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 25102.2 of the Corporations Code, relating to real estate investments.
Title
Real estate investments: securities: qualification exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB647 Morrell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 647 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB647 Morrell (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 647 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB647 Morrell (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 263, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2206.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1022.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10232.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10232.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10238 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25102.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |