CA SB646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66013 of the Government Code, relating to utility services.
Title
Local agency utility services: extension of utility services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 646 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB646 Morrell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB646 Morrell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2460.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |