CA SB645 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2025.295 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to depositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil discovery: depositions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB645 Monning Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 645 Monning Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB645 Monning (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-08-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2179.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-06-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4).
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-08SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 592.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2).
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure2025.295New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback