CA SB645 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8482.3, 8482.8, 8483, and 8483.1 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs.
Title
After school programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB645 Hancock (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB645 Hancock (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 522.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8482.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8482.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8483.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |