CA SB644 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 19240, 19241, 19242, and 19242.2 of, and to add and repeal Sections 19241.5, 19242.05, and 19242.3 of, the Government Code, relating to state employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited Examination and Appointment Program: persons with developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-03 - Unfinished Business SB644 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - SB 644 Hancock Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate 3rd Reading SB644 Hancock (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2015-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2444.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2784.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-07-15AssemblyJuly 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-06-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-04-27SenateApril 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 593.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2015-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19240Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19241Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19241.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19242Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19242.05New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19242.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19242.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_644&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150407_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150630_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150828_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150413_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150602_0330PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150624_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150427_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150902_1113AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_644_vote_20150903_1046AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback