CA SB642 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2282.5 of, and to add Sections 2057 and 2408.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 5917 and 5923 of the Corporations Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care: facilities: medical privileges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateMay 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 956.) (April 28).
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2057New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2282.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2408.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Corporations Code5917Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code5923Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback