CA SB641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1351.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mexican prepaid health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB641 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2017-03-29SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-29SenateApril 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-21SenateMarch 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., PUB. S., and JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11165Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11165.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11165.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1351.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback