CA SB64 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Eggman.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 42301.19 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 636 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fossil-fuel generation units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 64 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 33 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Natural Resources] and [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB64 Wieckowski (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29AssemblyMotion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Eggman.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18).
2018-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2017-05-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-04SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 727.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-04SenateRead first time.
2016-12-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 26.
2016-12-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69500Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code42301.19New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code354New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code636New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback