CA SB639 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1191 of, and to amend and repeal Section 1191.5 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Minimum wages: persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB639 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 639 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB639 Durazo et al (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 639 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB639 Durazo et al (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 2587.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 13. Page 2942.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 858.) (April 20). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1191.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |