CA SB638 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 980 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: personal social media of applicant or employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Labor and Employment] and [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB638 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2022-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2022-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2022-06-16AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and P. & C.P.
2021-06-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-05-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-04-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 702.) (April 7).
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code980Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback