CA SB638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 855, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1947.6 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leases: electric vehicle charging stations: insurance coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB638 Allen Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 638 Allen Senate Third Reading By Gallagher (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB638 Allen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 855, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2839.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 654.) (April 9).
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1947.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback