CA SB637 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19962 and 19963 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling: local moratorium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 637 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 637 Newman Senate Third Reading By Maienschein Amend By MAIENSCHEIN Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB637 Newman et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 637 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 637 Newman Senate Third Reading By Maienschein Amend By MAIENSCHEIN Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB637 Newman et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Senate | Failed passage. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 5347.) (August 30) |
2022-08-30 | Senate | That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5210.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Stone. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | (Corrected September 8). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2783.) |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 13). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 956.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19963 | Amended Code | Citation Text |