CA SB637 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18901, 18901.1, 18901.2, and 18901.3 of, and to amend the heading of Article 23 (commencing with Section 18901) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: Prevention of Animal Homelessness and Cruelty Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 637 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB637 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB637 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3172.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1280.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1106.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18901.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18901.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18901.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |