CA SB635 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18036 and 24916 of, and to add Sections 18190, 19183.5, and 24996 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: gross income exclusions: opportunity zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18036Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18190New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19183.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24916Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24996New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback