CA SB635 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 12097.5) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Governor’s Office of Business and Economic Development: local economic development liaison services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 635 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB635 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB635 Hueso (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB635 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB635 Hueso (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4114.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12097.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |