CA SB634 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22011, 22302, 22802, 24204, and 26804 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 20309, 20320, 20322, 20324, 22820, 31530, 31565.5, 31680.2, 31680.3, 31732, and 31781.2 of, and to add Section 21499.1 to the Government Code, relating to retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB634 L., P.E. & R. (Cortese) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 634 L., P.E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB634 L., P.E. & R (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 634 L., P.E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB634 L., P.E. & R (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2038.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2374.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 26804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20309 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 21499.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31565.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31680.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31680.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31732 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31781.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |