CA SB633 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1799.91, 1799.92, and 1799.96 of the Civil Code, relating to contracts.
Title
Consumer credit contracts: translations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB633 Limón Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 633 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB633 Limón (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 633 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB633 Limón (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4655.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5639.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 2819.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Limón. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Limón. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1799.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1799.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1799.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |