CA SB632 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the California Victim Compensation Board, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Victim Compensation Board: payment of claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB632 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - SB 632 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Holden (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB632 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - SB 632 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Holden (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB632 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4571.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2819.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2777.) (January 18). |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |