CA SB632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 746 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: State Board of Forestry and Fire Protection: vegetation treatment program: final program environmental impact report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB632 Galgiani et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1155.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-08SenateApril 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21080.48Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21168.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code746Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback