CA SB631 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1904 of, and to repeal Section 1906 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB631 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 631 Hueso Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB631 Hueso (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 631 Hueso Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB631 Hueso (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 2428.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 8). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | June 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1906 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |