CA SB630 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7095 of, and to add Section 7083.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to businesses and professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors State License Board: regulation of contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 630 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB630 Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2023-08-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2023-08-17SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-08-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-07-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2023-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-05-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2023-05-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1054.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 636.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7083.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7095Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback