CA SB630 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - September 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 422.56 of the Penal Code, relating to hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: hate crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB630 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11AssemblySeptember 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-09-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-09-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-31AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-28AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2017-08-24AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-06-15AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-06-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13).
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 856.) (April 25).
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
2017-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback