CA SB630 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66801 of, to add Section 66802 to, and to add and repeal Section 66802.5 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 6217.6 of, and to add Section 6717.6.1 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to the California Tahoe Regional Planning Agency.
Title
California Tahoe Regional Planning Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB630 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 630 Pavley Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB630 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 630 Pavley Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB630 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2292.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3022.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1161.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1018.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 467.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |