CA SB629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3007.05 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 14902 of the Vehicle Code, relating to identification cards.
Title
Identification cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB629 Roth et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 629 Roth Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB629 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 629 Roth Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB629 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2386.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2693.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2021-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1093.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 690.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3007.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |