CA SB629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 409.7 to the Penal Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public peace: media access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB629 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 629 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB629 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 629 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB629 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 7. Page 5364.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 18). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 409.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |