CA SB628 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 879, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 879, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.5 (commencing with Section 18700) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to food access.
Title
State Healthy Food Access Policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB628 Hurtado Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 628 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Wilson (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Hurtado (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 628 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Wilson (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Hurtado (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 879, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3461.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1177.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18700 | New Code | See Bill Text |