CA SB628 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8753.5 of the Government Code, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 14240) to Chapter 4 of Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
California Creative Workforce Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB628 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 628 Allen Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Allen (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 628 Allen Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB628 Allen (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2608.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 2936.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. & E. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8753.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14240 | New Code | See Bill Text |