CA SB624 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 1.5 (commencing with Section 1000) to the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Equity and Outdoor Access Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB624 Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1233.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 985.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 15).
2021-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2021-04-13SenateApril 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W., E.Q., and APPR.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code1000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback