CA SB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2191.10 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: liens: recordation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 624 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By RIDLEY-THOMAS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB624 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1144.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenatePublished May 9 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 945.) (May 3).
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2017-04-18SenateApril 26 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code155Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2191.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback