CA SB623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27565 and 31490 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic toll and transit fare collection systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2021-04-26SenateApril 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 780.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code27565Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code31490Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback