CA SB622 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Set for hearing January 18.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 11:30 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 23.5 (commencing with Section 70043) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: State Department of Social Services: individuals serving foster youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2022-01-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-06SenateSet for hearing January 12.
2021-04-14SenateApril 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-08SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code70043New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback