CA SB620 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 13350) to Chapter 2 of Title 3 of Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal offender record information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal offender record information: referral of persons on supervised release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB620 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 620 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB620 Portantino (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB620 Portantino Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB620 Portantino (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2882.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1192.)
2019-05-21SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Portantino.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1105.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 803.) (April 23).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13350New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback