CA SB62 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1174.1, 2670, 2671, 2673, 2673.1, and 2675.5 of, and to add Section 2673.2 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: garment manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB62 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Durazo et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Durazo et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2635.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2934.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 2787.) |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2780.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1228.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 685.) (April 6). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1174.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2675.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |