CA SB62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2087 of, and to repeal Section 2089.26 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to endangered species.
Title
Endangered species: accidental take associated with routine and ongoing agricultural activities: state safe harbor agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Assembly - SB 62 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1001.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | April 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 332.) (March 12). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2087 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2089.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |