CA SB62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 19910) to Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Affordable Senior Housing Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Jackson et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Jackson et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and H. & C.D. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1313.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2016-12-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 26. |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12945.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19910 | New Code | See Bill Text |