CA SB62 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 309.8 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: Office of the Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB62 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 62 Hill Senate Third Reading By HADLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 62 Pavley Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Pavley (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 62 Hill Senate Third Reading By HADLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 62 Pavley Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Pavley (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5584.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 5606.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39 |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5956.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1292.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 25). |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 30. |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69612.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69613 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69613.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69613.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69615.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69615.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 69615.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 70007 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 70008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 309.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |